Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#494 | Journal Page: 2018 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2018 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2018 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |