House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|