Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2739 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2739
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of barber schools, private beauty
 culture schools, and other facilities used to teach or perform the
 practice of barbering or cosmetology.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1601.353, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1601.353.  REQUIRED FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT. (a) The
 department may approve an application for a permit for a barber
 school that offers instruction to persons seeking a certificate
 under Section 1601.253 if the school:
 (1)  is located in:
 (A)  a municipality with a population of more than
 50,000 that has a building of permanent construction containing at
 least 2,000 square feet of floor space, including classroom and
 practical areas, covered in a hard-surface floor-covering of tile
 or other suitable material; or
 (B)  a municipality with a population of 50,000 or
 less or an unincorporated area of a county that has a building of
 permanent construction containing at least 1,000 square feet of
 floor space, including classroom and practical areas, covered in a
 hard-surface floor-covering of tile or other suitable material;
 (2)  has the following equipment:
 (A)  at least 10 student workstations that include
 a chair that reclines, a back bar, and a wall mirror;
 (B)  a sink behind every two workstations;
 (C)  adequate lighting for each room;
 (D)  at least 10 classroom chairs and other
 materials necessary to teach the required subjects; and
 (E)  access to permanent restrooms and adequate
 drinking fountain facilities; and
 (3)  meets any other requirement set by the commission.
 (b)  The department may approve an application for a permit
 for a barber school that offers instruction to persons seeking a
 certificate, license, or permit under this chapter, other than a
 certificate under Section 1601.253, if the school:
 (1)  has adequate space, equipment, and instructional
 material, as determined by the commission, to provide quality
 classroom training; and
 (2)  meets any other requirement set by the commission.
 (c)  A barber school that satisfies the requirements of
 Subsection (a) may offer instruction in barbering to persons
 seeking any certificate, license, or permit under this chapter.
 (d)  Instruction received at a barber school subject to
 Subsection (b) may not be used to satisfy the requirements to obtain
 a Class A barber certificate under Section 1601.253.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1602.303, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1602.303.  PRIVATE BEAUTY CULTURE SCHOOL LICENSE.
 (a)  [A person holding a private beauty culture school license may
 maintain an establishment in which any practice of cosmetology is
 taught, including providing an eyelash extension application
 training program described by Section 1602.2572.
 [(b)]  An application for a private beauty culture school
 license to instruct persons seeking a license under Section
 1602.254 must be accompanied by the required license fee and
 inspection fee and:
 (1)  be on a form prescribed by the department;
 (2)  be verified by the applicant; and
 (3)  contain a statement that the building:
 (A)  is of permanent construction and is divided
 into at least two separate areas:
 (i)  one area for instruction in theory; and
 (ii)  one area for clinic work;
 (B)  contains a minimum of:
 (i)  2,800 square feet of floor space if the
 building is located in a county with a population of more than
 100,000; or
 (ii)  1,800 square feet of floor space if the
 building is located in a county with a population of 100,000 or
 less;
 (C)  has access to permanent restrooms and
 adequate drinking fountain facilities; and
 (D)  contains, or will contain before classes
 begin, the equipment established by commission rule as sufficient
 to properly instruct a minimum of 10 students.
 (b)  An application for a private beauty culture school
 license to instruct persons seeking a license or certificate under
 this chapter, other than a license under Section 1602.254, must be
 accompanied by the required license fee and inspection fee and:
 (1)  be on a form prescribed by the department;
 (2)  be verified by the applicant;
 (3)  contain a statement that the building:
 (A)  is of permanent construction and is divided
 into at least two separate areas:
 (i)  one area for instruction in theory; and
 (ii)  one area for clinic work;
 (B)  has adequate space, equipment, and
 instructional material, as determined by the commission, to provide
 quality classroom training; and
 (C)  has access to permanent restrooms and
 adequate drinking fountain facilities; and
 (4)  meet any other requirement set by the commission.
 (c)  The applicant is entitled to a private beauty culture
 school license if:
 (1)  the department determines that the applicant is
 financially sound and capable of fulfilling the school's
 commitments for training;
 (2)  the applicant's facilities pass an inspection
 conducted by the department under Section 1603.103; [and]
 (3)  the applicant has not committed an act that
 constitutes a ground for denial of a license; and
 (4)  the applicant meets any other requirement set by
 the commission.
 (d)  A private beauty culture school that satisfies the
 requirements of Subsection (a) may offer instruction in cosmetology
 to persons seeking any license or certificate under this chapter.
 (e)  Instruction received at a private beauty culture school
 subject to Subsection (b) may not be used to satisfy the
 requirements to obtain an operator license under Section 1602.254.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 1603.104, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1603.104.  PERIODIC [AND RISK-BASED] INSPECTIONS.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 1603.104(c) and (e), Occupations Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 adopt rules to implement Sections 1601.353 and 1602.303,
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *