House | 05/19/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3751 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1479 | Journal Page: 3751 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |