Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1215
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|