E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1785
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1427
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|