Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2878 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1172 | Journal Page: 3276 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3230 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1141 | Journal Page: 3230 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3230 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | 3-P. King | Journal Page: 3229 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(b) | Journal Page: 3228 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3228 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |