House | 04/27/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 286 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 286 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |