House | 05/11/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1289 | Journal Page: 3285 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Postponed | 5/11/17 3:59 AM | Journal Page: 3134 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 11(a) | Journal Page: 3134 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3134 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Postponed | 5/9/17 4:59 AM | Journal Page: 2927 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2927 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Postponed | 5/8/17 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 2662 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2662 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Postponed | 5/5/17 7:45 AM | Journal Page: 2431 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2431 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |