Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2798 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Farrar (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2798
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 17, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county to implement a pilot program
 to reuse wastewater at county facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 341, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 341.0391 to read as follows:
 Sec. 341.0391.  COUNTY PILOT PROGRAM FOR WASTEWATER REUSE.
 (a) This section applies only to a county with a population of more
 than 3.3 million.
 (b)  A county may implement a pilot program to reuse any form
 of wastewater at a county facility for subsurface irrigation and
 toilet and urinal flushing. The program must require the wastewater
 to be treated at the facility before reuse.
 (c)  The commission may adopt rules to ensure that a program
 implemented under this section does not create a nuisance and does
 not threaten human health or damage the quality of surface water and
 groundwater in this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *