Senate | 05/09/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#538 | Journal Page: 2097 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Workman, Israel, Hinojosa, Morrison, E. Rodriguez, Howard, Isaac, Schubert, Cyrier, and Wilson | Journal Page: 2040 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 859 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 859 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |