Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2818 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Romero, Jr., Clardy H.B. No. 2818
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the practice of marriage and family therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.002(6), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (6)  "Marriage and family therapy" means providing
 professional therapy services to individuals, families, or married
 couples, alone or in groups, that involve applying family systems
 theories and techniques. The term includes the evaluation,
 diagnostic assessment, and remediation of mental, cognitive,
 affective, behavioral, or relational dysfunction, disease, or
 disorder in the context of marriage or family systems and may
 include the use of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental
 Disorders and the International Classification of Diseases.  The
 practice of marriage and family therapy does not constitute the
 practice of medicine and does not include prescribing medication,
 treating a physical disease, or providing any service outside the
 scope of practice of a licensed marriage and family therapist or a
 licensed marriage and family therapist associate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *