House | 05/09/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1517 | Journal Page: 3039 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 861 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 861 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |