House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 861
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 861
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|