Senate | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2824 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#957 | Journal Page: 2824 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2824 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2824 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2728 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2728 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(a) | Journal Page: 2727 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2727 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 988 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 988 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 927 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 927 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |