E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4679
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1776
|
Journal Page: 4679
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4679
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#602
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Burkett
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1035
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|