Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2856 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Villalba (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2856
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to names of domestic and foreign filing entities for
 transacting business in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.002, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (21-a) and amending Subdivision (23)
 to read as follows:
 (21-a)  "Fictitious name" means an assumed name:
 (A)  that a foreign filing entity adopts for use
 because the name of the entity as stated in the entity's certificate
 of formation or similar organizational instrument is not available
 for use under the laws of this state; and
 (B)  under which the foreign filing entity is
 registered to transact business in this state, in accordance with
 Chapter 9.
 (23)  "Filing instrument" means an instrument,
 document, consent, or statement that is required or authorized by
 this code to be filed by or for an entity with the filing officer in
 accordance with Chapter 4.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 5, Business Organizations
 Code, is amended by adding Section 5.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.002.  EVIDENCE OF ESTABLISHED RIGHT TO
 INDISTINGUISHABLE NAME. Notwithstanding Sections 5.053, 5.102,
 and 5.153, the secretary of state may accept a name if the entity or
 person seeking acceptance of the filing instrument with the
 indistinguishable name delivers to the secretary of state a
 certified copy of the final judgment of a court of competent
 jurisdiction that establishes the entity's or person's right to the
 name in this state.
 SECTION 3.  Section 5.053, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.053.  DISTINGUISHABLE [IDENTICAL AND DECEPTIVELY
 SIMILAR] NAMES REQUIRED [PROHIBITED]. (a) The name of a [A] filing
 entity or the name under which [may not have a name, and] a foreign
 filing entity registers [may not register] to transact business in
 this state must be distinguishable in the records of the secretary
 of state from [under a name, that is the same as, or that the
 secretary of state determines to be deceptively similar or similar
 to]:
 (1)  the name of another existing filing entity;
 (2)  the name of a foreign filing entity that is
 registered under Chapter 9;
 (3)  the fictitious name under which a foreign filing
 entity is registered to transact business in this state;
 (4)  a name that is reserved under Subchapter C; or
 (5) [(4)]  a name that is registered under Subchapter
 D.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply if the other entity or the
 person for whom the name is reserved or registered, as appropriate,
 provides to the secretary of state a notarized written statement of
 the entity's or person's consent to the use of the [similar] name.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply if the secretary of state
 determines that the names are the same.
 SECTION 4.  Section 5.102, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.102.  LIMITATION ON THE RESERVATION OF CERTAIN NAMES
 [PROHIBITED; EXCEPTIONS]. (a)  The secretary of state may [not]
 reserve a name under this subchapter only if the name [that] is
 distinguishable in the records of the secretary of state from [the
 same as, or that the secretary of state considers deceptively
 similar or similar to]:
 (1)  the name of an existing filing entity;
 (2)  the name of a foreign filing entity that is
 registered under Chapter 9;
 (3)  the fictitious name under which a foreign filing
 entity is registered to transact business in this state;
 (4)  a name that is reserved under this subchapter; or
 (5) [(4)]  a name that is registered under Subchapter
 D.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply if the other entity or the
 person for whom the name is reserved or registered, as appropriate,
 provides to the secretary of state a notarized written statement of
 the entity's or person's consent to the subsequent reservation of
 the [similar] name.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply if the secretary of state
 determines that the names are the same.
 SECTION 5.  Section 5.153, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.153.  LIMITATION ON THE REGISTRATION OF CERTAIN NAMES
 [REGISTRATIONS PROHIBITED; EXCEPTIONS]. (a) The secretary of
 state may [not] register a name under this subchapter only if the
 name [that] is distinguishable in the records of the secretary of
 state from [the same as, or that the secretary of state determines
 to be deceptively similar or similar to]:
 (1)  the name of an existing filing entity;
 (2)  the name of a foreign filing entity that is
 registered under Chapter 9;
 (3)  the fictitious name under which a foreign filing
 entity is registered to transact business in this state;
 (4)  a name that is reserved under Subchapter C; or
 (5) [(4)]  a name that is registered under this
 subchapter.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply if:
 (1)  the other entity or the person for whom the name is
 reserved or registered, as appropriate, provides to the secretary
 of state a notarized written statement of the entity's or person's
 consent to the registration of the [similar] name; or
 (2)  the applicant is a bank, trust company, savings
 association, or insurance company that has been in continuous
 existence from a date that precedes the date the indistinguishable
 [conflicting] name is filed with the secretary of state.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply if the secretary of state
 determines that the names are the same.
 SECTION 6.  Section 9.105, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 9.105.  USE OF DISTINGUISHABLE NAME REQUIRED [SIMILAR
 TO PREVIOUSLY REGISTERED NAME]. If the secretary of state
 determines that the [a foreign filing entity's] name of a foreign
 filing entity or the fictitious name under which it is registered to
 transact business in this state does not comply with Chapter 5 [is
 the same as, deceptively similar to, or similar to a name of a
 filing entity or foreign filing entity as provided by or reserved or
 registered under this code], the secretary of state may not accept
 for filing the certificate of reinstatement unless the foreign
 filing entity contemporaneously amends its registration to change
 its name to a name that complies with Chapter 5, or provides a
 fictitious name under which the foreign filing entity will transact
 business in this state that complies with Chapter 5 [obtains
 consent for the use of the similar name].
 SECTION 7.  Section 11.203, Business Organizations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.203.  USE OF DISTINGUISHABLE NAME REQUIRED [SIMILAR
 TO PREVIOUSLY REGISTERED NAME]. If the secretary of state
 determines that a filing entity's name contained in a certificate
 of reinstatement filed under Section 11.202 does not comply with
 Chapter 5 [is the same as, deceptively similar to, or similar to a
 name of a filing entity or foreign entity on file as provided by or
 reserved or registered under this code], the secretary of state may
 not accept for filing the certificate of reinstatement unless the
 filing entity contemporaneously amends its certificate of
 formation to change its name to a name that complies with Chapter 5
 [or obtains consent for the use of the similar name].
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect June 1, 2018.
 * * * * *