Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2869 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 85R19226 DMS-D
22 By: Ortega, Pickett, González of El Paso, H.B. No. 2869
33 Blanco
44 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2869:
55 By: Smithee C.S.H.B. No. 2869
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the salary of a bailiff in El Paso County.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Sections 53.0091(a), (b), and (d), Government
1313 Code, are amended to read as follows:
1414 (a) Each bailiff appointed under Section 53.002(c) shall be
1515 paid an annual salary out of the general fund of El Paso County,
1616 unless another source of funding is approved by the commissioners
1717 court. The council of judges shall set the salary in writing
1818 consistent with pay scales adopted by the commissioners court that
1919 are comparable to other positions within El Paso County. [The
2020 appointing judge shall set the salary in writing, but except as
2121 otherwise provided by this section, the annual salary shall be set
2222 at $18,000 on August 26, 1985, and thereafter the $18,000 annual
2323 salary shall increase as provided by Subsection (c).]
2424 (b) Bailiffs appointed under Section 53.002(c) who held
2525 office as bailiffs under that section [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd
2626 Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas
2727 Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th
2828 Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas
2929 Civil Statutes),] on June 30, 2017 [August 25, 1985], are entitled
3030 to receive at least the same annual salary or compensation under
3131 this section as they received [under those Acts] on that date
3232 [August 26, 1985].
3333 (d) A person appointed to succeed a bailiff who held office
3434 as bailiff under Section 53.002(c) [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd
3535 Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas
3636 Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th
3737 Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas
3838 Civil Statutes),] is not entitled to be paid the same annual salary
3939 paid to the bailiff the person [he] succeeds, but is entitled to
4040 receive an annual salary as provided by Subsection (a) [the annual
4141 salary as provided by this section so that the bailiffs' salaries
4242 under this section will become uniform with the passage of time. A
4343 person appointed to succeed any bailiff before October 1, 1986, is
4444 entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a). A
4545 person appointed to succeed any bailiff on or after October 1, 1986,
4646 is entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a) or
4747 the salary set on the date the bailiff is appointed for a Grade 20 of
4848 the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under
4949 Grade 20, whichever is greater. A bailiff whose annual salary is
5050 set on September 30, 1986, at $18,000 under this section is on
5151 October 1, 1986, entitled to any salary increase provided for under
5252 Subsection (c) or the salary set on October 1, 1986, for a Grade 20
5353 of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under
5454 Grade 20, whichever is greater. After October 1, 1986, all salary
5555 increases for bailiffs shall be uniform as provided for in
5656 Subsection (c). If a substantial number of those job titles or
5757 positions listed on the effective date of this section under Grade
5858 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation are removed from
5959 Grade 20 or the El Paso County Job Guide Designation is replaced
6060 with some other system for setting employees' salaries under those
6161 job titles or positions listed under Grade 20 of the El Paso County
6262 Job Guide Designation, on the date a new bailiff is appointed, the
6363 starting salary being paid at that time by El Paso County to the
6464 functional equivalent of Grade 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide
6565 Designation shall be used in place of Grade 20. In determining the
6666 functional equivalent of Grade 20 under this section, the job
6767 titles, positions, or their equivalent listed under Grade 20 on
6868 August 26, 1985, shall be considered as the only factors].
6969 SECTION 2. Sections 53.0091(c) and (e), Government Code,
7070 are repealed.
7171 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.