Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2887 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 85R11054 SMT-D
22 By: Thierry H.B. No. 2887
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of
88 the appraised value of the residence homestead of a veteran of the
99 United States armed services who served in the armed services for a
1010 certain period.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 11.13, Tax Code, is amended by amending
1313 Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (s) to read as follows:
1414 (i) The assessor and collector for a taxing unit may
1515 disregard the exemptions authorized by Subsection (b), (c), (d),
1616 [or] (n), or (s) [of this section] and assess and collect a tax
1717 pledged for payment of debt without deducting the amount of the
1818 exemption if:
1919 (1) prior to adoption of the exemption, the unit
2020 pledged the taxes for the payment of a debt; and
2121 (2) granting the exemption would impair the obligation
2222 of the contract creating the debt.
2323 (s) In addition to any other exemptions provided by this
2424 section, a veteran of the United States armed services who served in
2525 the armed services for at least three years is entitled to an
2626 exemption from taxation of $5,000 of the appraised value of the
2727 veteran's residence homestead.
2828 SECTION 2. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
2929 to read as follows:
3030 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
3131 the market value of all taxable property less:
3232 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
3333 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b), [or] (c), or
3434 (s), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each
3535 school district;
3636 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
3737 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
3838 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
3939 district;
4040 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
4141 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
4242 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
4343 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
4444 of any captured appraised value of property that:
4545 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
4646 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
4747 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
4848 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
4949 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
5050 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
5151 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
5252 provided by former Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31,
5353 1999, and within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries
5454 existed on September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to
5555 the property regardless of when made;
5656 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
5757 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
5858 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
5959 before September 1, 1999; and
6060 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
6161 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
6262 (5) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
6363 value of property that:
6464 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
6565 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
6666 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
6767 (ii) the project plan for which includes
6868 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
6969 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
7070 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
7171 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
7272 or for affordable housing;
7373 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
7474 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
7575 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
7676 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
7777 (6) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
7878 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
7979 (7) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
8080 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
8181 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
8282 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
8383 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
8484 (8) the portion of the appraised value of residence
8585 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
8686 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
8787 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
8888 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
8989 required by law;
9090 (9) a portion of the market value of property not
9191 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of:
9292 (A) action required by statute or the
9393 constitution of this state, other than Section 11.311, Tax Code,
9494 that, if the tax rate adopted by the district is applied to it,
9595 produces an amount equal to the difference between the tax that the
9696 district would have imposed on the property if the property were
9797 fully taxable at market value and the tax that the district is
9898 actually authorized to impose on the property, if this subsection
9999 does not otherwise require that portion to be deducted; or
100100 (B) action taken by the district under Subchapter
101101 B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code, before the expiration of the
102102 subchapter;
103103 (10) the market value of all tangible personal
104104 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
105105 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
106106 (11) the appraised value of property the collection of
107107 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
108108 Code;
109109 (12) the portion of the appraised value of property
110110 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
111111 Section 33.065, Tax Code; and
112112 (13) the amount by which the market value of a
113113 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
114114 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
115115 that section.
116116 SECTION 3. Section 11.13(s), Tax Code, as added by this Act,
117117 applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on
118118 or after January 1, 2018.
119119 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2018, but only
120120 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
121121 Regular Session, 2017, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
122122 ad valorem taxation a portion of the assessed value of the residence
123123 homestead of a veteran of the United States armed services who
124124 served in the armed services for a certain period is approved by the
125125 voters. If that constitutional amendment is not approved by the
126126 voters, this Act has no effect.