Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1672 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#735 | Journal Page: 2520 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2472 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2472 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |