E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|