E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
January 1, 2019
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#671
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Moody
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|