E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4148
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4148
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4148
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5753
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5502
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5502
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5502
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4813
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2952
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2951
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Canales
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 972
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|