Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2937 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Canales, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2937
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1, 1
 present not voting; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2937 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program under which a
 licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to public high
 school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0764 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0764.  MEDICAL DUAL CREDIT PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 board shall develop and implement a pilot program under which a
 licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to high school
 students enrolled in a school district in partnership with the
 district.
 (b)  The board shall select up to three licensed hospitals to
 participate in the pilot program. Each hospital selected must be
 accredited by The Joint Commission and:
 (1)  have been issued:
 (A)  a certificate of approval to offer a program
 of instruction by the Texas Workforce Commission under Subchapter
 C, Chapter 132; or
 (B)  a certificate of authority to award a degree
 for a program of study by the board under Subchapter G of this
 chapter; or
 (2)  be accredited to offer a degree program by a
 recognized accrediting agency.
 (c)  A licensed hospital selected under Subsection (b):
 (1)  may offer under the pilot program only dual credit
 courses that are in the curriculum of the hospital's authorized
 program of instruction or study or accredited degree program, as
 applicable; and
 (2)  subject to Subdivision (1) and Subsection (d),
 shall determine the content of each dual credit course offered
 under the pilot program with the goal of ensuring that the course is
 transferable for course credit applied toward a certificate or
 degree at an institution of higher education.
 (d)  A licensed hospital selected under Subsection (b) must
 design the dual credit courses offered under the pilot program to
 enable students to earn a variety of certifications, certificates,
 and degrees, including at least one certification or certificate
 while the student is in high school. The available certifications,
 certificates, and degrees must be selected based on:
 (1)  the needs of the hospital;
 (2)  the terms of the hospital's agreements with
 partnering school districts to provide the dual credit courses
 under the pilot program; and
 (3)  the goal of preparing students for employment in
 the health care field.
 (e)  A student enrolled in a dual credit course offered under
 the pilot program is entitled to the benefits of the Foundation
 School Program for the time spent by the student on that course, in
 accordance with rules adopted by the commissioner of education.
 (f)  A student may not be charged for tuition, fees, or
 required textbooks or other instructional materials for a dual
 credit course offered under the pilot program. The school district
 in which the student is enrolled is responsible for the cost of the
 student's tuition, fees, or required textbooks or other
 instructional materials for that course to the extent that those
 amounts are not waived by the licensed hospital offering the
 course.
 (g)  The board may adopt rules as necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.0764, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2017-2018 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *