Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2937 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2937


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program under which a
 licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to public high
 school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0764 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0764.  MEDICAL DUAL CREDIT PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 board shall develop and implement a pilot program under which a
 licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to high school
 students enrolled in a school district in partnership with the
 district.
 (b)  The board shall select one licensed hospital located in
 a county that borders the United Mexican States and that has a
 population of at least 700,000 and not more than 800,000 to
 participate in the pilot program. The hospital must be accredited
 by The Joint Commission and:
 (1)  have been issued:
 (A)  a certificate of approval to offer a program
 of instruction by the Texas Workforce Commission under Subchapter
 C, Chapter 132; or
 (B)  a certificate of authority to award a degree
 for a program of study by the board under Subchapter G of this
 chapter;
 (2)  be accredited to offer a degree program by the
 appropriate recognized regional accrediting agency; or
 (3)  must:
 (A)  have entered into a partnership with an
 institution of higher education to offer dual credit courses under
 the pilot program; and
 (B)  be seeking authorization to offer a program
 of instruction or study as described by Subdivision (1) or
 accreditation to offer a degree program as described by Subdivision
 (2).
 (c)  The licensed hospital selected under Subsection (b):
 (1)  may offer under the pilot program only dual credit
 courses that are in the curriculum of the hospital's program of
 instruction or study or degree program described by Subsection
 (b)(1), (2), or (3), as applicable; and
 (2)  subject to Subdivision (1) and Subsection (d),
 shall determine the content of each dual credit course offered
 under the pilot program with the goal of ensuring that the course is
 transferable for course credit applied toward a certificate or
 degree at an institution of higher education.
 (d)  The licensed hospital selected under Subsection (b)
 must design the dual credit courses offered under the pilot program
 to enable students to earn a variety of certifications,
 certificates, and degrees, including at least one certification or
 certificate while the student is in high school. The available
 certifications, certificates, and degrees must be selected based
 on:
 (1)  the needs of the hospital;
 (2)  the terms of the hospital's agreements with
 partnering school districts to provide the dual credit courses
 under the pilot program; and
 (3)  the goal of preparing students for employment in
 the health care field.
 (e)  A student enrolled in a dual credit course offered under
 the pilot program is entitled to the benefits of the Foundation
 School Program for the time spent by the student on that course, in
 accordance with rules adopted by the commissioner of education.
 (f)  A student may not be charged for tuition, fees, or
 required textbooks or other instructional materials for a dual
 credit course offered under the pilot program. The school district
 in which the student is enrolled is responsible for the cost of the
 student's tuition, fees, or required textbooks or other
 instructional materials for that course to the extent that those
 amounts are not waived by the licensed hospital.
 (g)  The board may adopt rules as necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.0764, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2017-2018 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2937 was passed by the House on May 9,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 6, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2937 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2937 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 2, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2937 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 6; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2937 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor