Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1343 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#466 | Journal Page: 1956 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 829 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 829 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |