1 | | - | By: Holland, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2949 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
4 | | - | Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2949 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the maximum amount of a documentary fee charged by a |
---|
12 | 6 | | retail seller of motor vehicles. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Sections 348.006(e) and (f), Finance Code, are |
---|
15 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | (e) Prior to increasing the maximum amount of the |
---|
17 | 11 | | documentary fee the retail seller charges, a retail seller shall |
---|
18 | 12 | | provide written notice to the commissioner of the maximum amount of |
---|
19 | 13 | | the documentary fee the retail seller intends to charge unless the |
---|
20 | 14 | | maximum amount intended to be charged is considered reasonable as |
---|
21 | 15 | | provided by Subsection (f). The commissioner may review the amount |
---|
22 | 16 | | of a documentary fee a retail seller intends to charge for |
---|
23 | 17 | | reasonableness if the retail seller is required to provide written |
---|
24 | 18 | | notice of the fee increase under this subsection. In determining |
---|
25 | 19 | | whether a fee charged by a retail seller is reasonable, the |
---|
26 | 20 | | commissioner may consider the resources required by the retail |
---|
27 | 21 | | seller to perform the retail seller's duties under state and |
---|
28 | 22 | | federal law with respect to the handling and processing of |
---|
29 | 23 | | documents relating to the sale and financing of a motor vehicle. If |
---|
30 | 24 | | the commissioner determines that a documentary fee charged is not |
---|
31 | 25 | | reasonable, the commissioner may require that the documentary fee |
---|
32 | 26 | | charged be reduced or suspended. |
---|
33 | 27 | | (f) A documentary fee charged in accordance with this |
---|
34 | 28 | | section [before September 1, 2009,] is considered reasonable for |
---|
35 | 29 | | purposes of this section if the amount is less than or equal to the |
---|
36 | 30 | | amount of the documentary fee presumed reasonable as established by |
---|
37 | 31 | | rule of the finance commission. |
---|
38 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Sections 348.006(e) and (f), Finance Code, as |
---|
39 | 33 | | amended by this Act, apply only to the sale of a motor vehicle that |
---|
40 | 34 | | occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. The sale of a |
---|
41 | 35 | | motor vehicle that occurs before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
42 | 36 | | governed by the law in effect on the date of the sale, and the former |
---|
43 | 37 | | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
44 | 38 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
45 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 39 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 41 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2949 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 42 | + | 27, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 3 present, not |
---|
| 43 | + | voting. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2949 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 47 | + | 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 48 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 50 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 51 | + | Date |
---|
| 52 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | Governor |
---|