E
|
06/09/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4172
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4172
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1953
|
Journal Page: 5671
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5646
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3888
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#646
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
6-Krause
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
8-Moody
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-Krause
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#609
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
5-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2; Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
4-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2247
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/2/17 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|