House
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3751
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1361
|
Journal Page: 3751
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Referred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1084
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|