Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#802 | Journal Page: 2593 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2430 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#708 | Journal Page: 2430 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2430 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2430 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 287 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 287 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |