Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2968 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2968
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of a golf cart or utility vehicle on a
 public highway in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.404(a-2), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  Subsection (a-1) applies only to a county that:
 (1)  borders or contains a portion of the Red River;
 (2)  borders or contains a portion of the Guadalupe
 River and contains a part of a barrier island that borders the Gulf
 of Mexico; or
 (3)  is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision
 (2) and:
 (A)  has a population of less than 37,000
 [30,000]; and
 (B)  contains a part of a barrier island or
 peninsula that borders the Gulf of Mexico.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *