Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2985 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 2985
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the type of newspaper required for notice by
 publication in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2051.0441(a), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a notice published by a
 governmental entity or representative in a county:
 (1)  with a population of at least 30,000 and not more
 than 39,000 [36,000] that borders the Red River; or
 (2)  that does not have a newspaper described by
 Section 2051.044 published in the county.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *