Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2987 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fallon (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2987
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 19, 2017;
 May 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 23, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Denton County Municipal
 Utility Districts Nos. 4 and 5; providing authority to issue bonds;
 providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapters 7980 and 7981 to read as
 follows:
 CHAPTER 7980. DENTON COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 4
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7980.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
 means the Denton County Municipal Utility District No. 4.
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 7980.051.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES.  The district has the powers and duties provided by the
 general law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code,
 applicable to municipal utility districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 7980.052.  AUTHORITY FOR ROAD PROJECTS. Under Section
 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, the district may improve,
 operate, or maintain any macadamized, graveled, or paved roads in
 existence on September 1, 2017, or improvements, including storm
 drainage, in aid of those roads inside the district.
 Sec. 7980.053.  ROAD STANDARDS AND REQUIREMENTS. (a)  A road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards, zoning and
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each municipality in
 whose corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction the road
 project is located.
 (b)  If a road project is not located in the corporate limits
 or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality, the road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards,
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each county in which
 the road project is located.
 Sec. 7980.054.  ACCEPTANCE OF ROADS.  (a)  The district by
 order of the board may accept any road inside the district that has
 been dedicated by plat or otherwise transferred to the public.
 (b)  On acceptance of the road by the district, the district
 is considered the owner of the accepted road and shall record
 ownership of the road in the deed records of Denton County.
 Sec. 7980.055.  ELECTION REQUIRED.  The district may not
 exercise the powers authorized by Section 7980.052 unless approved
 by a vote of a majority of district voters voting at an election
 called for that purpose.
 SUBCHAPTER C. BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS
 Sec. 7980.101.  ISSUANCE OF BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS FOR
 ROAD PROJECTS PROHIBITED. The district may not issue bonds or other
 obligations payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, impact
 fees, revenue, contract payments, grants, or other district money,
 or any combination of those sources, to pay for a road project
 authorized by Section 7980.052.
 CHAPTER 7981. DENTON COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 5
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7981.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
 means the Denton County Municipal Utility District No. 5.
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 7981.051.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES.  The district has the powers and duties provided by the
 general law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code,
 applicable to municipal utility districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 7981.052.  AUTHORITY FOR ROAD PROJECTS. Under Section
 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, the district may improve,
 operate, or maintain any macadamized, graveled, or paved roads in
 existence on September 1, 2017, or improvements, including storm
 drainage, in aid of those roads inside the district.
 Sec. 7981.053.  ROAD STANDARDS AND REQUIREMENTS. (a)  A road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards, zoning and
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each municipality in
 whose corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction the road
 project is located.
 (b)  If a road project is not located in the corporate limits
 or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality, the road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards,
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each county in which
 the road project is located.
 Sec. 7981.054.  ACCEPTANCE OF ROADS.  (a)  The district by
 order of the board may accept any road inside the district that has
 been dedicated by plat or otherwise transferred to the public.
 (b)  On acceptance of the road by the district, the district
 is considered the owner of the accepted road and shall record
 ownership of the road in the deed records of Denton County.
 Sec. 7981.055.  ELECTION REQUIRED.  The district may not
 exercise the powers authorized by Section 7981.052 unless approved
 by a vote of a majority of district voters voting at an election
 called for that purpose.
 SUBCHAPTER C. BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS
 Sec. 7981.101.  ISSUANCE OF BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS FOR
 ROAD PROJECTS PROHIBITED. The district may not issue bonds or other
 obligations payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, impact
 fees, revenue, contract payments, grants, or other district money,
 or any combination of those sources, to pay for a road project
 authorized by Section 7981.052.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The legislature validates and confirms all
 governmental acts and proceedings of the Denton County Municipal
 Utility Districts Nos. 4 and 5 that were taken before the effective
 date of this Act.
 (b)  This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2)  has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect August 1, 2017.
 * * * * *