E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1965
|
Journal Page: 5712
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5710
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5103
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5103
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5103
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2522
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2522
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2522
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2522
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#549
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|