House | 05/02/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |