Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3024 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Price, Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 3024
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the removal of a public school student from an
 interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected
 concussion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.156, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 38.156.  REMOVAL FROM PLAY IN PRACTICE OR COMPETITION
 FOLLOWING CONCUSSION.  A student shall be removed from an
 interscholastic athletics practice or competition immediately if
 one of the following persons believes the student might have
 sustained a concussion during the practice or competition:
 (1)  a coach;
 (2)  a physician;
 (3)  a licensed health care professional; [or]
 (4)  a person licensed under Chapter 201, Occupations
 Code; or
 (5)  the student's parent or guardian or another person
 with legal authority to make medical decisions for the student.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *