Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3239 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1051 | Journal Page: 3079 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3079 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3079 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2922 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2922 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Postponed | 5/8/17 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2418 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2418 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |