House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred directly to s/c on Special Water Districts by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|