Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3032 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R4979 AAF-D
 By: Blanco H.B. No. 3032


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation by the Texas Veterans Commission of a
 veteran suicide prevention action plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.024.  VETERAN SUICIDE PREVENTION ACTION PLAN. (a)
 The commission, in collaboration with the United States Department
 of Veterans Affairs, veteran advocacy groups, medical providers,
 and any other organization or interested party the commission
 considers appropriate, shall develop a comprehensive action plan to
 increase access to and availability of professional veteran health
 services to prevent veteran suicides.
 (b)  The action plan must:
 (1)  identify opportunities for raising awareness of
 and providing resources for veteran suicide prevention;
 (2)  identify opportunities to increase access to
 veteran mental health services;
 (3)  identify funding resources to provide accessible,
 affordable veteran mental health services;
 (4)  provide measures to expand public-private
 partnerships to ensure access to quality, timely mental health
 services; and
 (5)  provide for proactive outreach measures to reach
 veterans needing care.
 (c)  The commission shall make specific short-term and
 long-term statutory, administrative, and budget-related
 recommendations to the legislature and the governor regarding the
 policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the action
 plan developed under this section.  The short-term recommendations
 must include a plan for state implementation beginning not later
 than September 1, 2019. The initiatives and reforms in the
 short-term plan must be fully implemented by September 1, 2021. The
 long-term recommendations must include a plan for state
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2021. The
 initiatives and reforms in the long-term plan must be fully
 implemented by September 1, 2027.
 (d)  The commission shall include in its strategic plan under
 Chapter 2056 the plans for implementation of the short-term and
 long-term recommendations under Subsection (c).
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.