Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3042 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffines) H.B. No. 3042
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2017;
 May 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating July 7 as Fallen Law Enforcement Officer
 Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.066 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.066.  FALLEN LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER DAY. (a)  July
 7 is Fallen Law Enforcement Officer Day in recognition of the
 ultimate sacrifice made by Texas law enforcement officers killed in
 the line of duty.
 (b)  Fallen Law Enforcement Officer Day shall be regularly
 observed by appropriate ceremonies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *