Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3045 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dale (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3045
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an election to reduce or increase the sales and use tax
 rate imposed by a municipality for the benefit of a Type B
 development corporation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 505, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 505.2566 to read as follows:
 Sec. 505.2566.  ELECTION TO REDUCE OR INCREASE TAX RATE. (a)
 An authorizing municipality that has imposed a sales and use tax
 under this chapter may, in the same manner and by the same procedure
 as the municipality imposed the tax, reduce or increase the tax rate
 by a majority of the voters of the municipality voting at an
 election held for that purpose.
 (b)  On petition of 10 percent or more of the registered
 voters of the authorizing municipality requesting an election to
 reduce or increase the tax rate under this chapter, the governing
 body of the municipality shall order an election on the issue.
 (c)  The tax rate may be reduced or increased to any rate that
 is an increment of one-eighth of one percent, that the authorizing
 municipality determines is appropriate, and that would not result
 in a combined rate that exceeds the maximum combined rate
 prescribed by Section 505.256(a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *