E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5427
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5427
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1922
|
Journal Page: 5427
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5427
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1073
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2984
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2984
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 850
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|