E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4921
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4922
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1836
|
Journal Page: 4922
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4921
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Miles
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2503
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2503
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2503
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|