Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB308 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R3269 CAE-D
 By: Burrows H.B. No. 308


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction
 provided to certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.2516(c-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Revenue generated by the portion of a district's
 maintenance and operations tax rate included in calculating the
 district's compressed tax rate under Section 42.101(a-1) and local
 share under Section 42.252(a-1) is included in determining the
 amount to which a district is entitled under this section, but may
 not increase the total amount of revenue per weighted student to
 which the district is entitled under this section.  This subsection
 expires September 1, 2027 [2017].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 42.2518(a) and (e), Education Code, as
 effective until September 1, 2017, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For the 2015-2016 through 2026-2027 [and 2016-2017]
 school years, a school district is entitled to additional state aid
 to the extent that state and local revenue under this chapter and
 Chapter 41 is less than the state and local revenue that would have
 been available to the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as
 those chapters existed on September 1, 2015, if the increase in the
 residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on tax increases
 under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 (e)  This section expires August 31, 2027 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  Section 42.2518(a), Education Code, as effective
 September 1, 2017, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2027-2028 [2017-2018] school year, a
 school district is entitled to additional state aid to the extent
 that state and local revenue under this chapter and Chapter 41 is
 less than the state and local revenue that would have been available
 to the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as those chapters
 existed on September 1, 2015, excluding any state aid that would
 have been provided under former Section 42.2516, if the increase in
 the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article
 VIII, Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on tax
 increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by
 S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not
 occurred.
 SECTION 4.  Notwithstanding Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, the following
 provisions are effective September 1, 2027:
 (1)  Section 57.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 12.106(a), Education Code;
 (2)  Section 57.18, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended the
 heading to Section 42.2516, Education Code;
 (3)  Section 57.19, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.2516(a), Education Code;
 (4)  Section 57.23, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.253(h), Education Code;
 (5)  Section 57.29, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 26.08(i), Tax Code;
 (6)  Section 57.32(a), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed various
 provisions of the Education Code; and
 (7)  Section 57.32(b), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed Sections
 26.08(i-1) and (j), Tax Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.