E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1059
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2960
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2960
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|