Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3239 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1065 | Journal Page: 3095 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3095 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3094 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Postponed | 5/9/17 5:26 PM | Journal Page: 3089 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3089 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2960 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Amended | 1-Burns | Journal Page: 2960 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2960 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2298 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |