E
|
05/31/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/31/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1839
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2596
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2596
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2596
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2596
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#794
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
3-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#707
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Villalba
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Pensions
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|