Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2814
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#942
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred directly to s/c on Special Water Districts by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 974
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 974
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|