LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB3177
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3177
Compare Versions
HB3177 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3177 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3177 Enrolled May 22, 2017
HB3177 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB3177 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB3177 Comm Sub May 2, 2017
HB3177 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB3177 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3177 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3177 Enrolled May 22, 2017
HB3177 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
HB3177 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB3177 Comm Sub May 2, 2017
HB3177 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare