Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3201 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby H.B. No. 3201


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a well as a two-year inactive well or
 three-year inactive well for purposes of the oil and gas severance
 tax exemption.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 202.056, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Railroad Commission of
 Texas.
 (2)  "Hydrocarbons" means any oil or gas produced from
 a well, including hydrocarbon production.
 (3)  "Three-year inactive well" means any well that has
 not produced in more than one month in the three years prior to the
 date of application for severance tax exemption under this section.
 (4)  "Two-year inactive well" means a well that has not
 produced oil or gas in more than one month in the two years
 preceding the date of application for severance tax exemption under
 this section.
 (b)  Hydrocarbons produced from a well qualify for a 10-year
 severance tax exemption if the commission designates the well as a
 three-year inactive well or a two-year inactive well. The
 commission may require an applicant to provide the commission with
 any relevant information required to administer this section. The
 commission may require additional well tests to determine well
 capability as it deems necessary. The commission shall notify the
 comptroller in writing immediately if it determines that the
 operation of the three-year inactive well or two-year inactive well
 has been terminated or if it discovers any information that affects
 the taxation of the production from the designated well.
 (c)  If the commission designates a three-year inactive well
 under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating the
 well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(3)
 of this section. The commission may not designate a three-year
 inactive well under this section after February 29, 1996. If the
 commission designates a two-year inactive well under this section,
 it shall issue a certificate designating the well as a two-year
 inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(4)(3) of this section.
 The commission may not designate a two-year inactive well under
 this section after February 28, 2010.
 (d)  An application for three-year inactive well
 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section. An application for two-year inactive well certification
 shall be made during the period September 1, 1997, through August
 31, 2009, to qualify for the tax exemption under this section.
 Hydrocarbons sold after the date of certification are eligible for
 the tax exemption.
 (e)  The commission may revoke a certificate if information
 indicates that a certified well was not a three-year inactive well
 or a two-year inactive well, as appropriate, or if other lease
 production is credited to the certified well. Upon notice to the
 operator from the commission that the certificate for tax exemption
 under this section has been revoked, the tax exemption may not be
 applied to hydrocarbons sold from that well from the date of
 revocation.
 (f)  The commission shall adopt all necessary rules to
 administer this section.
 (g)  To qualify for the tax exemption provided by this
 section, the person responsible for paying the tax must apply to the
 comptroller. The comptroller shall approve the application of a
 person who demonstrates that the hydrocarbon production is eligible
 for a tax exemption. The comptroller may require a person applying
 for the tax exemption to provide any relevant information necessary
 to administer this section. The comptroller shall have the power to
 establish procedures in order to comply with this section.
 (h)  If the tax is paid at the full rate provided by Section
 201.052(a), 201.052(b), 202.052(a), or 202.052(b) before the
 comptroller approves an application for an exemption provided for
 in this chapter, the operator is entitled to a credit against taxes
 imposed by this chapter in an amount equal to the tax paid. To
 receive a credit, the operator must apply to the comptroller for the
 credit before the expiration of the applicable period for filing a
 tax refund claim under Section 111.104.
 (i)  Penalties
 (1)  Any person who makes or subscribes any
 application, report, or other document and submits it to the
 commission to form the basis for an application for a tax exemption
 under this section, knowing that the application, report, or other
 document is false or untrue in a material fact, may be subject to
 the penalties imposed by Chapters 85 and 91, Natural Resources
 Code.
 (2)  Upon notice from the commission that the
 certification for a three-year inactive well or a two-year inactive
 well has been revoked, the tax exemption shall not apply to oil or
 gas production sold after the date of notification. Any person who
 violates this subsection is liable to the state for a civil penalty
 if the person applies or attempts to apply the tax exemption allowed
 by this chapter after the certification for a three-year inactive
 well or a two-year
 inactive well is revoked. The amount of the
 penalty may not exceed the sum of:
 (A)  $10,000; and
 (B)  the difference between the amount of taxes
 paid or attempted to be paid and the amount of taxes due.
 (3)  The attorney general may recover a penalty under
 Subdivision (2) of this subsection in a suit brought on behalf of
 the state. Venue for the suit is in Travis County.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.